Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alipour Golestan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lederer & Nojima Llp, against Decristo Dianna, represented by Linder Judith S. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Patricia D. Nieto presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time603 days |
Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: June 03, 2016Answer
Date: 2015-01-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-12-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 25, 2016Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2015-06-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 04, 2016Notice
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.