Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trocadero Tija, Williams Allen Jr., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Jeffrey S. Reichman, against Garay Cesar Efrain, Pacific 9 Transportation Inc., Yang Ming Marine Transport, represented by Worthe Todd C. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with David Sotelo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 04, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time232 days |
Proof-Service/Summons
Date: January 16, 2015Receipt
Date: December 24, 2014Complaint
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: January 08, 2015Answer
Date: 2014-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: April 06, 2015Request for Dismissal
Date: July 30, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.