Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Funk Dirk, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by George R. Kindley Law Offices Of, against Dodds John, Does 1 Through 25, Paramount Petroleum Corporation, represented by Jackson Erik L., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions738 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time778 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE VIA U.S. MAIL
Date: October 04, 2016PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 08, 2016Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail (PARTY SERVED COZEN O'CONNOR )
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Notice (OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL )
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-01-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (stipulated protective order )
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (VIA FACSIMILE AND U.S. MAIL PARTY SERVED AMY B. ALDERFER, ESQ. )
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application ( to Continue Trial Date )
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-09T00:00:00Notice-Settlement
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment (160614136050 9/28/2016 01:30 pm )
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Notice (OF LIEN ON BEHALF OF AIG Claims, Inc. )
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-03-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Notice (OF ENTRY OF ORDER )
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-30T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Statement of Facts (IN SUPP OF MSJ 160614136050 9/28/2016 01:30 pm )
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-30T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Opposition Document (TO DEFENDANT PARAMOUNT PETROLEUM CORPORATION'S EX PARTE APPLICATION )
Date: 2016-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-07-15T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice) (LIEN OF AIG CLAIMS INC. )
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-12-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: January 17, 2017Request for Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION_ )
Date: January 17, 2017Notice
Date: February 09, 2017Notice (OF ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL )
Date: February 09, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.