Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sanchez Luis, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Law Jml, against Lowe'S Companies Inc., Lowe'S Home Center Llc., Lowe'S Hiw Inc., represented by Hunton & Williams Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Susan Bryant-Deason presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions92 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time338 days |
Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: November 25, 2015Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Document:Amendment to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: November 25, 2015Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Certificate of Mailing Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-03T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Notice Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Motion Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing - Attachment Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-06-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Motion for Continuance Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff & Plaintiff In Pro Per
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Answer Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Document:Mtn for Summary Adjud of Issues Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Order Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Order Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Motion Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Notice Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Notice Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-09-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Motion Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00Document:Motion for Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Document:Supplemental Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-08T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Luis Sanchez (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Order Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Lowe's Companies, Inc. (Defendant); Lowe's HIW, Inc. (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Notice Filed by Lowe's Home Center, LLC. [DOE 1] (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2015-02-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Motion for Continuance
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-06-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-06-16T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-07-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing - Attachment
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-08-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2015-08-26T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-09-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-09-03T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-21T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.