Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Amin Taraneh, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Thalheimer Bernard J. Esq., against 468 South Roxbury Associates Lp, Martinez Irma Susan Doe 3, Nic Real Estate Group Inc, United Glass & Mirror Doe 2, represented by Abbott Thomas P. Esq., Kincaid Mark L. Esq, Caliman Meredith L. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions424 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time750 days |
Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Defendant's Demurrer
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: October 07, 2016Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-04-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2015-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-09-03T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: October 11, 2016Request for Dismissal
Date: December 20, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.