Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Haberman Julia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Rehwald William Esq., against Abel Philip L., represented by Shaffer Carmin K., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michelle Williams Court presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time540 days |
Answer
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: March 09, 2016Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: May 24, 2016Notice of Settlement
Date: March 24, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.