Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Padilla Angel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mazza Steven L. Esq., against Li Shao, represented by Gilsleider & Mcmahon, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 01, 2014 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time203 days |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2015Motion
Date: March 27, 2015Notice of Settlement
Date: April 23, 2015Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: April 28, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.