Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Los Angeles Superior Court-Unlimited Juri filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case against Chung Sung Hyun, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management59 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment By Court - Before Trial |
Case Cycle Time1039 days |
Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: October 05, 2017Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Document:Report-Status Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 05, 2017Document:Notice of Incoming Case Transfer Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Default Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-02-23T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Document:Request to Enter Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by null
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 25, 2017First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Status Report Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: October 25, 2017Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by SUNG HYUN CHUNG (Defendant)
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-02-23T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Incoming Transfer
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-08-11T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-01-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-09-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-02-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: October 25, 2017Order
Date: 2017-10-05T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.