Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Foremost Insurance Company Grand Rapids, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Early Maslach, Maslach Early, against Durant Ryder Joseph, Durant Ryder Joseph A Minor By And, Zapeda Cassandra, Zepeda Cassandra, represented by Burns Nigel Law Offices Of, Danton Teresa A. -Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Norwalk Courthouse with John A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn A Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2014 |
CategoryUninsured Motorist (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions176 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseNorwalk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time750 days |
Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 05, 2015Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: July 15, 2015Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: January 14, 2015Motion to Dismiss
Date: April 17, 2015Complaint in Interpleader
Date: September 22, 2014Cross-Complaint
Date: November 07, 2014Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: February 29, 2016Summons Filed
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Complaint in Interpleader
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Complaint-in-Interpleader
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Rtn of Service of Summons & Compl
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Cross-complaint filed (IN INTERPLEADER )
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed (IN INTERPLEADER )
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2014-11-12T00:00:00Application
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Application
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-11-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-11-13T00:00:00Summons Issued (RE: CROSS-COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER; )
Date: 2014-11-13T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2014-11-13T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Demurrer (TO DURANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF DURANT'S CROSS-COMPLAINT; )
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Memorandum - Other
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Opposition (/DECLARATION TO EX PARTE )
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (CIVIL DEPOSIT RE: EX PARTE FEE )
Date: 2015-04-15T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR DISCHARGE; )
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2015-04-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-04-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Opposition (TO MOTION FOR DISMISSAL/DISCHARGE )
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (BY MAIL AS TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR DISMISSAL/DISCHARGE )
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-06-05T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Reply/Response (TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISCHARGE/DISMISS; )
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE FOR MOTIN TO DISCHARGE; )
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-06-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE RESOLUTION OF INTERPLEADER ACTION )
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Petition (EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION; )
Date: 2015-07-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-08-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (RE RESOLUTION OF INTERPLEADER ACTION; )
Date: 2015-07-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Notice (OF RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE FOR MOTION TO DISCHARGE; )
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-10-08T00:00:00Notice (OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AS FOLLOWS: EARLY MASLACH )
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Order of Transfer
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00Notice (AMENDED NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE; NEW DATE IS FEB. 18, 2016 )
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (-CROSS COMPLAINT AS TO CASSANDRA ZEPEDA )
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (-CROSS COMPLAINT AS TO CHRISTINE ZEPEDA )
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Order of Dismissal (IN MINUTE ORDER OF 2/18/16 DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER; )
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint (FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY )
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2016-02-29T00:00:00Notice (DEFENDANT/CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES; )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Petition for Comp Minor's Claim
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Ord-Apprv Minor's Comp Claim
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice-Settlement (CONDITIONAL; )
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Ord-Apprv Minor's Comp Claim
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Order (TO DISBURSE FUNDS )
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Notice (OF SCHEDULED HEARINGS; )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Request for Correction
Date: 2016-07-26T00:00:00Petition for Comp Minor's Claim (EXPEDITED PETITION )
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00Notice-Settlement
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-07-25T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: October 11, 2016Miscellaneous-Other
Date: September 19, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.