Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Adbul- Nour Bint Bandar Bin Mohammed Bin, filed a(n) Civil case against Apex Investments Inc., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with John P. Doyle presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management164 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions302 days |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time720 days |
NOTICE OF RULING RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES
Date: February 02, 2017Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Clerk
Date: February 22, 2017Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Document:Receipt for Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Nour Bint Bandar Bin Mohammed Bin Adbul- (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: February 21, 2017Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Document:Brief Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Document:Judgment Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Document:Motion for Summary Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2015-09-08T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Document:Receipt for Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Document:OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Brief Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Motion Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Brief Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Statement of Decision Filed by Court
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Court
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: February 21, 2017Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Clerk
Date: February 22, 2017Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2015-09-08T00:00:00Document:Statement of Decision Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-08-19T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2015-05-29T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2015-06-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-11-17T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-12-31T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-09-08T00:00:00Receipt for Exhibits
Date: 2016-08-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-03-21T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-05-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2016-05-19T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Judgment
Date: February 21, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: February 22, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.