Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Michelson Kyle, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Herzog Ian, Herzog Ian Isaac, against Merck & Co. Inc., Merck Corporation, Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp., Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. Doe 1, New Hair Institiute Medical Group, (total of 11) See All represented by Brecht Celeste M., Brecht Celeste Marie, Butler Snow, D'Angelo Vincent, D'Angelo Vincent P., (total of 13) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Craig D. Karlan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management1375 days |
|
Filing DateAugust 15, 2014 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice - Physicians & Surgeons (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1096 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2014-08-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-10-06 00:00:00
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2017-01-11T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2017-01-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Order of Transfer
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed
Date: 2017-03-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-04-05T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION )
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF ACTION )
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRANSFER ORDER )
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-04-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-04-26T00:00:00Separate Statement of Und. Facts
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF WILLIAM RASSMAN )
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Separate Statement of Und. Facts
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Declaration (OF JAE P. PAK )
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF VINCENT D'ANGELO )
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CASE MGMT CONFERENCE )
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion (AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT )
Date: 2017-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (OF CMC TO 5-24-17 )
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-05-16T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-05-17T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-22T00:00:00Order (ADMITTING CHARLES MORROW TO APPEAR AS COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE: )
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-08 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-07-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Amended Notice
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-21T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit)
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MGMT CONF. )
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit)
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING )
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice (OF TRIAL SETTING; )
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Other - (Civil Deposit)
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES; CIVIL DEPOSIT; )
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Reply (to Opposition to Motion to Amend Request for Admissions Nos 8 & 9;)
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Opposition (to Plff's Mtn to Amend Request for Admissions #8&9;)
Date: 2018-11-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (1) Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Raquel Lucas Herraiz to...))
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend (Legacy)))
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Notice of Unopposed Verified Application of Raquel Lucas Herraiz)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-01-15T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Ex Parte Notice of Unopposed Verified Application of David M. Cohen)
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (1) Hearing on Ex Parte Application of Raquel Lucas Herraiz to...))
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER RE APPLICATION OF DAVID M. COHEN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Order (granting unopposed verified application of David M.Cohen to appear as counsel Pro Hac Vice)
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Declaration (Pltf Declaration in Opposition to defendants' ex parte app to continue trial)
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Order Continuing Trial Da...))
Date: 2019-03-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Notice (Plaintiff's Notice of Court's Order Changing Date of Informal Discovery Conference)
Date: 2019-05-24T00:00:00Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice
Date: 2019-05-22T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2019-06-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re protective order)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (for [Proposed] Protective Order)
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice))
Date: 2019-06-26T00:00:00Motion for Protective Order
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-07-18T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re MSC Setting;) of 07/31/2019)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re MSC Setting;))
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (to Stay/Quash Deposition filed under seal)
Date: 2019-09-04T00:00:00Notice (of Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing - Other Re: Production of Documents; Hearing on Ex Pa...))
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-09T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Stay_Quash Deposition)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Declaration (of Celeste M. Brecht ISO Opposition to Ex Parte Application to Stay)Quash Deposition)
Date: 2019-09-05T00:00:00Amendendment to Motion for Protective order
Date: 2019-09-10T00:00:00Opposition (to Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-11-25T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC); Hearing on Plaintiff'...))
Date: 2019-10-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (Exhibits 1-10 to the Declaration of of Celeste M. Brecht)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Reply (Pltf Reply in support of plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (Exhibits 16-22 to the Declaration of of Celeste M. Brecht)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration (Exhibits 11-15 to the Declaration of of Celeste M. Brecht)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-12-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Protective Order; Hearing on Ex Parte A...))
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-12-12T00:00:00Notice (OF PAYMENT OF PRO HAC VICE ANNUAL RENEWAL FEES FOR DAVID M. COHEN AND RAQUEL LUCAS HERRAIZ)
Date: 2020-02-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Court Closures;) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Brief (in Advane of Informal Discovery Conference Before the Honorable Judge Karlan)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-10-15T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continuance of Merck Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication)
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration re Excerpts of Depositions)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Opposition (Points and Authorities in Opposition to Merck Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration in support of Continuance)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Kyle Michelson iso Opp to Merck MSJ)
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00Objection (Objection and M/Strike Deft Supp Decl and Evid filed in Reply to Opp to M/Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment OR ALTERNATIVE ADJUDIC...))
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Reply (in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration (Of Celeste M. Brecht In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Evidentiary Objections To The Compendium Of Evidence
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment OR ALTERNATIVE ADJUDIC...))
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Joint Stipulation And Order Re Deposition
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Hearing on Motion for Summary ...))
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment OR ALTERNATIVE ADJUDIC...))
Date: 2021-10-07T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Trial Setting Conference; Moti...))
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Supplemental Opposition to Defendant Merck's Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment OR ALTERNATIVE ADJUDIC...))
Date: 2021-06-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-05-28T00:00:00Notice (of Payment of Pro Hac Vice Annual Renewal Fees For Charles E. Morrow and W. Mcdonald Plosser)
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO AUGMENT/SUPPLEMENT OPPOSIT...))
Date: February 28, 2022Opposition (to Ex Partee Application to Augment/Supplement Opposition to Summary Judgment)
Date: February 28, 2022EX PARTE APPLICATION TO AUGMENT/SUPPLEMENT OPPOSITION TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 25, 2022Notice (NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 01/05/2022)
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Reply (Supplemental Reply Brief re Collateral Estoppel ISO MSJ)
Date: February 10, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Ruling
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment OR ALTERNATIVE ADJUDIC...))
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2021-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter))
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative,...))
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2017-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Motion (TO AMEND REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; )
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (re Gail Davidson, CSR#12823)
Date: 2018-12-13T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application
Date: 2019-02-06T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Stipulation - No Order (Stipulation to Extend Five Year)
Date: 2019-04-17T00:00:00Declaration ( of Ian Herzog to Pltf IDC Statement)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Reply (Pltf reply to Merck Opp to M/Quash SDT or for Protective Order and Sanctions)
Date: 2019-07-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...))
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2019-07-10T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Court Closures;))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/20/2020)
Date: 2020-04-20T00:00:00Notice (of Payment and Annual Renewal of Pro Hac Vice Fees)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice (Notice of Continued Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-04-21T00:00:00Notice (of Continued Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2020-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 05/11/2020)
Date: 2020-05-11T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE OUTSTANDING DISCOVERY ISSUES AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2020-08-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)))
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Brief (Brief re discovery dispute for IDC)
Date: 2020-09-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Removal to Federal Court
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Application
Date: 2017-03-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-05-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-22T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion
Date: 2019-02-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.