Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Rauba Joey Darren, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case against Dickson Carol Laurie, Grossi Blanche, Grossi Blanche L Trust, Grossi Family Trust, Grossi Harry A & B L Trust, (total of 8) See All represented by Boggs Josiah C. Iv, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Laura A. Seigle presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 15, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1441 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Before Trial - Lack Of Prosecution |
Case Cycle Time1672 days |
Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 08, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: December 06, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: January 23, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: January 23, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: July 01, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 08, 2019Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 22, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: April 28, 2017DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: April 28, 2017DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: July 19, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: July 19, 2017ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: August 10, 2017[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: August 16, 2017NOTICE OF RULING RE: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL
Date: August 16, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS; ETC.
Date: October 16, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER ESTABLISHING ADMISSIONS; ETC.
Date: November 30, 2017ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM ADMITTED REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: December 19, 2017COMPENDIUM OF EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: December 29, 2017ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; MOTION GRANTED
Date: March 23, 2018JUDGMENT ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: July 26, 2018Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 29, 2019Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 30, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: May 23, 2019Motion re: - MOTION RE: FOR ORDER GRANTING RELIEF FROM DISMISSAL
Date: July 08, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL (CCP 473))
Date: August 14, 2019Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-03-13T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-08-15T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-04-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-29 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-16 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-22T00:00:00Minute Order
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-07-28T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-10T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-11 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-11T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-04-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference))
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-03-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Trial Setting Conference) of 03/14/2019)
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Notice on Hearing About Court Fees (HEARING SET 04/30/19)
Date: 2019-04-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ((Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2018-12-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-06T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Return Receipt
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court) (GRANTED)
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2019-04-30T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Josiah Boggs re Plaintiff's Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: 2019-03-12T00:00:00Declaration (Declaration of Josiah Boggs re Plaintiff's Document Titled Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2019-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment))
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-01-23T00:00:00Declaration ( of Josiah Boggs in Response to Motion for Relief from Dismissal)
Date: 2019-06-28T00:00:00Order - Dismissal
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Motion re: (for order granting relief from dismissal)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 22, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)))
Date: August 14, 2019Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Dismissal (CCP 473)))
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.