Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barraza Brenda, Barraza Joseph Milton Alvarado, Barraza-Lazalde Maria Claudia, Brioso Sorto Dagoberto, Coreas Max Alberto, (total of 12) See All filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case represented by Castelblanco Law Group Aplc, against 5233 Monte Vista Street Llc, Rebah Maintenance Services Inc., Rohcs Property Management Co., represented by Citron & Citron, Hartsuyker Stratman & Williams-Abrego, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Ruth Ann Kwan presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management107 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2014 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time919 days |
DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6; ETC.
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.11
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.8; ETC.
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.19
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.18
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.17; ETC.
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.4; ETC.
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 ETC.
Date: December 15, 2016DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO.3; ETC.
Date: December 15, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION FOR PETITIONS TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF CLAIM
Date: January 19, 2017Complaint
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Application
Date: 2014-07-22T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-07-28T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-08-11T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2014-07-28T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Application
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2014-10-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-10-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-10-24T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-10-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-11-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-06-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2015-06-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-07-07T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-07-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-07-16T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service -
Date: January 19, 2017Motion for Leave
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-09-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-09-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-23T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Mail
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-12-10T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-01-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-02-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-03-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-03-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-03-23T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-05-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-05-27T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-07-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-12-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2014-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2015-01-20T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-12-13T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-12-15T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-12-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Petition
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 13, 2017Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 13, 2017Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 13, 2017Ord-Deposit Minor's Funds
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 13, 2017Notice
Date: 2017-04-01T00:00:00Order Approving Minor's Contract
Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 13, 2017Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 13, 2017Request for Dismissal
Date: July 05, 2017Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: June 13, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.