Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Camacho Lester, Lester Camacho, P. Paul Aghabala & Associates Inc., filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kuznetsky Law Group Pc, P. Paul Aghabala & Associates, Shabani Natali Esq., against Blue Jay Group Inc., Brentwood Holdings Partners Llc, Kuzenetsky Michael, Hayes Scott Bonino Ellingson Guslani Simonson & Clause Llp, represented by Horton Oberrecht Kirkpatrck & Martha, Oberrecht Kimberly S., Tharpe & Howell Llp, Tharpe Howell Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica Courthouse with H. Chester Horn, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 09, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial1177 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1370 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeVerdict |
Case Cycle Time1329 days |
NOTICE OF TAKING OFF CALENDAR DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS
Date: June 30, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF THE RAW TEST DATA OBTAINED BY PLAINTIFF'S PSYCHOLOGISTS
Date: September 21, 2017Motion re: - to Compel Deposition of Person Most Knowedgeable
Date: October 10, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #6
Date: October 19, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #7
Date: October 19, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE # 1
Date: October 24, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE # 5
Date: October 24, 2017DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE #13; ETC.
Date: October 25, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #4
Date: October 25, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE # 9
Date: October 27, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #8
Date: October 27, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #14
Date: October 30, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #16
Date: November 01, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #11
Date: November 02, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE # 2
Date: November 03, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE # 12
Date: November 06, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #15
Date: November 06, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #18
Date: November 06, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #17
Date: November 06, 2017TRIAL BRIEF; DEFENDANTS LIST AND SUMMARY OF TRIAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE
Date: November 08, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #29
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #27
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #1O
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #26
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #30
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #22
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #25
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' MOTION TN LIMINE #20
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #31
Date: November 13, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #28
Date: November 13, 2017PLAINTIFF, LESTER CAMACHO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 19
Date: November 14, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #24
Date: November 14, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #23
Date: November 14, 2017PLAINTIFF, LESTER CAMACHO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION IN LINTINE NO. 15
Date: November 14, 2017PLAINTIFF, LESTER CAMACHO'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS? MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 17
Date: November 14, 2017DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE #33
Date: January 04, 2018Opposition - to Defendant's Motion in Limine 21
Date: January 23, 2018Opposition - Amended Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 3
Date: January 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION IN LIMINE
Date: January 29, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION
Date: March 21, 2018Motion for New Trial
Date: March 23, 2018Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: MOTION
Date: March 27, 2018Motion to Tax Costs
Date: April 09, 2018Motion to Compel - Motion to Compel ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF PARTIAL
Date: October 18, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFA...)
Date: November 26, 2018Motion to Compel - Amended Motion to Compel Acknowlegement of Partial Satisfaction of Judgement
Date: November 26, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Acknowlegement of Partial Satisfa...)
Date: December 11, 2018Order - Order Granting Motion to Compel Acknowledgment of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: December 11, 2018AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT -
Date: January 31, 2017ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 08, 2017Association of Attorney
Date: 2015-03-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-07-09T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2015-04-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-05-27 00:00:00
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-05-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-06-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-10-20T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2016-03-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-03-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-15 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts
Date: 2016-04-15T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-07 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-10-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-31 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO EXCLUDE PLAINTIFF'S EXPERTS; ETC
Date: May 18, 2017Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2017-03-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-05-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-05-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-22 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-06-22T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-06-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-06-30 00:00:00
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-07-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-10T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-07-14T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-07-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-20 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-07-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-07-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-02 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-08-02T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-08-22T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-08-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-25 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-08-31T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-09-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-09-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-10-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-19T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-10-26 00:00:00
Date: 2017-10-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-11-02T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Request for Jury Instructions
Date: 2017-11-06T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Objection
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-13T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-27 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-01-09T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00Response
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2018-01-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Opposition (DEF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 34 )
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 22 )
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-01-30 00:00:00
Date: 2018-01-30T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED OPPOSITION TO DEF MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 23 )
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-05 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Stipulation (re: Jury Civil Trials )
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-06 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-08 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-09 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-09T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-13 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Brief (PLAINTIFF TRIAL BRIEF RE SURVEILLANCE VIDEO OBTAINED BY DEF )
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Opposition (DEF'S OPPOSITION TO TRIAL BRIEF RE SURVIELANCE VIDEO )
Date: 2018-02-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-16 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-22T00:00:00Jury Question ([2 questions] )
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Receipt (Plaintiff's Jury Fees )
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Jury Question
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Jury Question ([3 questions] )
Date: 2018-02-26T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Jury Verdict
Date: 2018-02-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Receipt (Def's Jury Fees )
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (MEMO OF COSTS (SUMMARY) PENDING )
Date: 2018-03-09T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Notice (PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENTION TO MOVE FOR A NEW TRIAL )
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Motion (DEF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF )
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Motion for New Trial
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Motion (PLAINTIFF MOTION FOR COST OF PROOF SANCTIONS )
Date: 2018-03-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (MEMO OF COSTS (SUMMARY) PENDING DOC SENT TO DEPT I FOR HEARING)
Date: 2018-03-26T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Opposition (DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR NEW TRIAL )
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Proof of Service (proof of hand delivery )
Date: 2018-04-04T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Motion to Tax Costs (PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST THE DEF )
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF PROOF OF SERVICE )
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00Reply (REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS AGAINST PLAINTIFF )
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Reply
Date: 2018-04-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY )
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY )
Date: 2018-04-17T00:00:00Reply (REPLY TO DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR COST OF PROOF SANCTIONS )
Date: 2018-04-18T00:00:00Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem (SHARON CAHN #6210 )
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-23 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Opposition (DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS )
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Opposition
Date: 2018-04-23T00:00:00Brief-Supplemental (PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF PROOF SANCTIONS )
Date: 2018-04-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Brief (FURTHER BRIEFING RE: PLAINTIFF'S COST OF PROOF MOTION )
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF PROOF OF SERVICE )
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2018-04-30T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF PAUL AGHABALA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MEMO OF COSTS & EXHIBITS )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Reply (PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEF'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX COSTS )
Date: 2018-05-03T00:00:00Notice (NOTICE OF DEF'S EX PARTE APP )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Declaration (DECLARATION OF KIMBERLY OBERRECHT IN SUPPORT OF DEF'S EX PARTE APP )
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-05-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-07T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-11T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-05-17T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-06-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-04 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-27T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2018-06-29T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2018-07-06T00:00:00Designation of Record on Appeal
Date: 2018-08-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-20T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Non-Compliance of Default on Appeal
Date: 2018-10-16T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel (Acknowlegement of Partial Satisfaction of Judgement)
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Minute Order ((HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF PARTIAL SATISFA...))
Date: 2018-11-26T00:00:00Notice (of Entry Of Order)
Date: December 14, 2018Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00Minute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Compel Acknowlegement of Partial Satisfa...))
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Appeal - Notice of Fees Due for Clerk's Transcript on Appeal
Date: April 26, 2019Order (Granting Motion to Compel Acknowledgment of Partial Satisfaction of Judgment)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00Appeal - Original Clerk's Transcript 6 - 10 Volumes Certified
Date: May 29, 2019Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: April 24, 2020Appeal Record Delivered (APPEALS FILED 5-11-18 & 6-1-18)
Date: May 31, 2019Reply to Opposition
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-15 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-15T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B290093)
Date: November 05, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.