Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Blbulyan Yeghisabet, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Steiner Neil Stuart, against Bloomingdales'S Inc., Does 1 To 50, Galleria Sherman Oaks, Macy'S Corporation Services Inc., Sherman Oaks Fashion Associates Lp, (total of 8) See All represented by Beatty & Myers Llp, Beatty Sean David, Lenkov Jeffrey M. Esq., Lenkov Jeffrey Myles, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Frank J. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 09, 2014 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions565 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time909 days |
Notice of Settlement
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-11-12T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2016-02-11T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-04-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-10-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-10-07T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2015-10-09T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2016-03-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-11-25T00:00:00Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)
Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00Motion to Dismiss
Date: 2016-04-29T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Stipulation & Order (TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGMENT AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Request-Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Notice-Demurrer
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice (OF ORDER )
Date: August 15, 2016Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-06-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Stipulation & Order
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice-Change of Address
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Stipulation & Order
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice-Demurrer (TO COMPLAINT )
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Request-Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: August 15, 2016Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2016-07-08T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2016-07-14T00:00:00Motion for Sanctions
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: September 28, 2016Stipulation & Order (STIP AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEMURRER AND CMC )
Date: 2016-08-04T00:00:00Motion-Sanctions
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Request-Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE ENTIRE ACTION )
Date: October 04, 2016Notice-Settlement (OF ENTIRE CASE )
Date: September 28, 2016(Request-Dismissal)
Date: October 04, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.