Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Southern California Gas Company, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Levy & Nourafchan Llp, against Does 1-100, Mike Prlich & Sons Inc, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Kevin C. Brazile presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 09, 2014 |
CategoryOther Intentional Tort-Notpi/Wd/Pd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time155 days |
Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: June 25, 2014Request and Entry of Dismissal
Date: September 11, 2014Proof of Service
Date: July 07, 2014OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: June 25, 2014Notice-Settlement
Date: August 05, 2014Paper file imaged and destroyed
Date: June 07, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.