Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Garbutt Shirlene, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Mcnulty Peter J. Esq., against 99 Cents Only Stores Llc, Does 1 To 50, represented by Dacorsi John R. Esq., Dolan Michael A. Jr. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 24, 2014 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1120 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time1120 days |
PROOF OF SERVICE BY FIRST-CLASS MAIL?CIVIL
Date: August 11, 2016ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL?CIVIL
Date: July 11, 2016DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #5 ETC.
Date: September 21, 2016DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE #2 ETC.
Date: September 21, 2016Motion re: - Motion re: Compel second physical exam
Date: January 23, 2017Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted
Date: January 27, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF SAHIRLENE GARBUTT TO UNDERGO A SECOND PHYSICAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 17, 2017ORDER RE: MOTION TO HAVE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED
Date: February 28, 2017NOTICE OF RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DEEM FACTS ADMITTED
Date: March 02, 2017Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Document:Notice of Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Receipt Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-06 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-03 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF TRIAL AND FSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-27 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Notice Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions (LIST OF PROPOSED ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Document:Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (160518129053 01:30 pm ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00List of Witnesses Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF TRIAL AND FSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Declaration Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00List of Exhibits Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF TRIAL AND FSC ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Document:ExParte Application & Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Witness List Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Declaration (DECL IN SUPP OF ATTYS MTN TO BE REL AS CNSL ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Statement of Case Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Document:Substitution of Attorney Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-24 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-11 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Order (RE: MOTION TO HAVE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED ) Filed by Court
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Shirlene Garbutt (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: May 17, 2017Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00ExParte Application & Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPL. ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-08 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Motion (MTN TO DISM CPLT 6561 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Notice of Motion Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: May 05, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-04 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice of Motion (MTN FOR JGMT ON THE PLEADINGS 6547 ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-03-24T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Answer to Unverified Complaint
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Notice (OF POSTING JURY FEES )
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-05-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Receipt (CIVIL DEPOSIT )
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Declaration (in support of attorney's motion to be relieved as counsel )
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Order (RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD )
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-28 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES FOR FSC 01/08/16 AND TRIAL 01/18/16 )
Date: 2015-06-23T00:00:00Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Order (RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY TELEPHONE ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Motion Filed by 99 Cents Only Stores LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-03-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-02-25T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF TRIAL AND FSC )
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00Statement of Case
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Jury Instructions (LIST OF PROPOSED )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF TRIAL AND FSC )
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other (LIST OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS TO BE USED AT TRIAL )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00List of Exhibits
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00List of Witnesses
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2016-04-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE )
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-05-12T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance (OF TRIAL AND FSC )
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-18 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE )
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-05-20T00:00:00Declaration (DECL IN SUPP OF ATTYS MTN TO BE REL AS CNSL )
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (160518129053 7/11/2016 01:30 pm )
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-06-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-03T00:00:00Notice (OF INTENT TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY TELEPHONE )
Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Order (GRANTING ATTORNEY'S MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL -CIVIL (COUNSEL FOR PLTFF) )
Date: 2016-07-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Serv of Ntc by Mail
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Motion in Limine (#5 - TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY RE: THE NON-PRODUCTION OF THE PRIVILEGED INCIDENT REPORT )
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-30 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Declaration (SUPPLEMENTAL DECL IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE APPL. )
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00ExParte Application & Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC & RELATED DATES )
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00ExParte Application & Order
Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-08 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2016-11-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Motion (FOR ORDER THAT FACTS ARE DEEMED ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS )
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Motion to Compel (PLAINTIFF TO UNDERGO A SECOND PHYSICAL EXAMINATION; )
Date: 2017-01-23T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Motion (MTN FOR JGMT ON THE PLEADINGS 6547 )
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-28 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Motion (MTN TO DISM CPLT 6561 )
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-24 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Order (MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF SAHIRLENE GARBUTT TO UNDERGO A SECOND PHYSICAL EXAMINATION )
Date: 2017-02-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Order (RE: MOTION TO HAVE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEEMED ADMITTED )
Date: 2017-02-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-21T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-17 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Order (RE: MOTION TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFF; MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS )
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-05-17 00:00:00
Date: May 17, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-05-05 00:00:00
Date: 2017-05-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-04-04 00:00:00
Date: 2017-04-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (RE MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS )
Date: 2017-04-19T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-04-17T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.