Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Akmal Sabra, Portillo Deborah, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Gianelli Robert Steven, Marron Ronald A, against Blue Shield Of California, California Physicians' Service Dba Blue Shield Of California, represented by Laska Joseph Edward Esq., Pimstone Gregory Neil Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Carolyn B. Kuhl presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 20, 2014 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage (Not Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment On The Pleading |
Case Cycle Time1673 days |
Other - - PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: September 12, 2018Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) -
Date: January 20, 2017Other - - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL
Date: May 24, 2018Other - - PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY APPROVAL MOTION
Date: May 24, 2018Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROBERT S. GIANELLI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL
Date: September 19, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Fairness Hearing; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees)
Date: October 17, 2018Complaint
Date: 2014-03-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-04-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-04-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-06-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-05-30T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-06-10T00:00:00Ntc of Unpaid Filing Fees
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2014-07-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-07-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-06-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-07-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-08-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Order-Protective
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-10-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-10-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-09-25T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2014-10-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-10-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-10-20T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-01-07T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-02-18T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-12-31T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2014-10-23T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-07-21T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2015-07-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-10-23T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-10-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-12-11T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-05-10T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-06-08T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-06-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-09-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-09-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-11-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-11-14T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2017-01-21T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-31T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2017-02-10T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-02-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-02-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-03-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2017-03-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-03-15T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Brief-Supplemental
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-05-23T00:00:00Response
Date: 2017-05-31T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-07-03T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2017-07-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-06-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2017-07-21T00:00:00Request
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2017-07-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-10-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-10-17T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-01-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-01-29T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-07-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-07-23T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2018-06-19T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-05-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice (of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Final approval of Proposed class Action Settlement)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2018-09-12T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Order of Final Order Approving Class Action Settlement and Judgment)
Date: October 23, 2018Minute Order ( (Fairness Hearing; Hearing on Motion for Attorney Fees))
Date: October 17, 2018Notice (OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARD)
Date: 2018-10-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-09-19T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: October 18, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.