Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mansur Bradford John, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by O'Connor Mark Esq., against Chrysler Group Llc, H.W. Hunter Inc., represented by Gates O'Doherty Gonter & Guy Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elizabeth Allen White presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 18, 2014 |
CategoryContract/Warranty Breach - Seller Plaintiff (No Fraud/Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1018 days |
DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES
Date: August 15, 2016Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Document:Request for Judicial Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Document:Affidavit of Prejudice--Peremptory Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Document:Demand for Jury Trial Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Document:Points and Authorities Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Document:Objection Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Order Filed by Judge
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Court
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff); Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Witness List Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff); Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) Filed by Plaintiff
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Document:Ord-Appt Apprv Rptr as Rptr protem Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Motion Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Order Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: December 30, 2016Notice of Settlement Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Notice Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Motion Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Objection Document Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Document:Receipt Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: December 30, 2016Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Points and Authorities Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff); Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2014-03-18T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-07-01T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Document:Motion to Compel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-11-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Document:Stip & Order-use CSR Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-11-10T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-09-19T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-11-25T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Motion to Compel Filed by Bradford John Mansur (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-10-28T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-05-02T00:00:00Answer Filed by Chrysler Group LLC (Defendant); H.W. Hunter, Inc. (Defendant)
Date: 2014-04-18T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Judge
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Court
Date: 2014-08-25T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-08-07T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Document:List of Witnesses Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-07-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-07-09T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-07-13T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2015-08-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2016-03-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-07T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-09-15T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-08-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2016-08-25T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-08-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: December 30, 2016For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.