Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kirakosian Albert, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Hittelman Paul M, against American Best Engineering Inc. Aka Avakian Engineering Inc. A California Corporation, Avakian Engineering Inc. Doe 1, Avakian Sergik, Avakian Sevak, represented by Gilanians Alexander, Zreik Sammy, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management230 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions64 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Proof of Service -
Date: August 24, 2016Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default - MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AMENDED
Date: September 28, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERGIK AVAKIAN IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT
Date: September 28, 2021Order - ORDER DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: November 01, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); HE...)
Date: November 01, 2021FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC
Date: January 27, 2017PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO FIRST AMINDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 16, 2017ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2017SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC
Date: April 14, 2017THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACR; ETC.
Date: September 06, 2017DEFENDANTS' DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; ETC
Date: October 12, 2017Minute order entered: 2015-12-21 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Default Judgment) of )
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-28 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re submission of default judgement...))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-09-20T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-17 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-17T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-11-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-15 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-06-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-11-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-12-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-07-13 00:00:00
Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-24 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-23T00:00:001N11's Ntc of Hrng on Demurrer
Date: 2017-02-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-02-20 00:00:00
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re continue trial and fsc)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-17T00:00:00Order (re Defendant's motion to be relieved as counsel)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2018-07-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-24 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-11 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-11T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-03 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-01-27T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: 2019-01-25T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Orders, etc.)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Reply to Opposition
Date: 2016-10-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-18 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-05-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-02-21 00:00:00
Date: 2017-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2017-10-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Motion for an Order
Date: 2017-12-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2018-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-11-10T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re lodge trial binders))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-21 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-21T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-07-31T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-10 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-14 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-14T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2017-08-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-14 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-07 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-07T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-03-15 00:00:00
Date: 2018-03-15T00:00:00Declaration (of Sergik Avakian in support of its motion to vacate default)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (Amended)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Objection (AND OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (Amended)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of )
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Declaration (of Avakian Engineering Inc. in Support of Motion to Vacate)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Continuance
Date: March 14, 2022Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2021-07-09T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); He...))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Why Plaintiff has not Filed the Defau...) of )
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...))
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration (of Sevak Avakian in support of its Motion to Vacate Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); He...))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: lodging on new default judgmen...))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Order (Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Declaration (of Sevak Avakian in support of its Motion to Vacate Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-06-10T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-06-18T00:00:00Proof of Service -
Date: August 23, 2016Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: January 25, 2019Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: January 25, 2019Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil
Date: February 20, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel)
Date: February 20, 2019Order - Order re Defendant's motion to be relieved as counsel
Date: February 20, 2019Objection - OBJECTION AND OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF AVAKIAN ENGINEERING INC. IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO VACATE
Date: August 11, 2021Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: August 11, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT (CCP 473.5); HE...)
Date: September 14, 2021Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEVAK AVAKIAN IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION TO VACATE ENTRY OF DEFAULT
Date: September 28, 2021Minute order entered: 2016-04-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Amended Answer
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-03-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-06-10T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-12-17T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-12-21T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-12-11T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-01 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-01T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-02-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-05-24 00:00:00
Date: 2016-05-24T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2014-11-18T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2014-06-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-04-08 00:00:00
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-01-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-06-25T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-04-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-19 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-25T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2014-03-21T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-07-29 00:00:00
Date: 2014-07-29T00:00:00Declaration ( of Lost Note -Plaintiff Albert Kirakosian Declarant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-10-06 00:00:00
Date: 2015-10-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2014-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-12-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-06 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-10-31 00:00:00
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package; Status Confere...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-01-09T00:00:00Default Entered
Date: 2014-02-13T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-20 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-06-11 00:00:00
Date: 2014-06-11T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-05-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-12 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-12-24T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2016-09-22T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-10-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-12-07 00:00:00
Date: 2015-12-07T00:00:00Brief (re motion)
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Notice (of Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (re continue trial and fsc)
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Application re Continuance of Trial and Final Status...))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of trial and final status conference)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Order (re Defendant's motion to be relieved as counsel)
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference))
Date: 2019-03-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re lodge trial binders))
Date: 2019-02-22T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference to Trial Date)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Orders, etc))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for Orders, etc.)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Ex Parte Order re Application)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re why the court should not enter the...))
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy))
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 09/03/2019)
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Notice (of Status Conference)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Declaration ( of Plaintiff Albert Kirakosian in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package; Status Confere...))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Declaration ( of Lost Note -Plaintiff Albert Kirakosian Declarant)
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package; Status Confere...))
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/27/2020)
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re submission of default judgement...))
Date: 2020-04-30T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package; Status Confere...))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re submission of default judgment ...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Default Judgment) of 03/24/2021)
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND OPPOSOITION TO MOTIONSTO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); He...))
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00Objection (AND OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (Amended)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Sergik Avakian in support of its motion to vacate default)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Declaration (of Sevak Avakian in support of its Motion to Vacate Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-09-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-09-29T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2018-04-12T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-11-16 00:00:00
Date: 2017-11-16T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Third Amended Complaint
Date: 2017-09-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-10-12 00:00:00
Date: 2018-10-12T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-01-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-03-29 00:00:00
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Notice (of Order re Mandatory Settlement Conference)
Date: 2018-10-04T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2017-10-12T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-12-06 00:00:00
Date: 2017-12-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-12-18T00:00:00Brief (re motion)
Date: 2018-04-11T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2018-03-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-10-26 00:00:00
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice (of continuance of trial and final status conference)
Date: 2018-10-24T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-03-16T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-08-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-06-07 00:00:00
Date: 2018-06-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-08-10 00:00:00
Date: 2018-08-10T00:00:00Notice (of Continuance of Final Status Conference to Trial Date)
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00Order
Date: 2018-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ((Ex Parte Application re Continuance of Trial and Final Status...))
Date: 2018-10-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-09-27 00:00:00
Date: 2018-09-27T00:00:00Notice (of Entry of Judgment or Order)
Date: 2019-02-21T00:00:00Declaration ( of Plaintiff Albert Kirakosian in Support of Plaintiff's Application for Default Judgment)
Date: 2019-10-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package; Status Confere...))
Date: 2019-10-24T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2018-04-26 00:00:00
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for Orders, etc))
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Order ([Proposed] Ex Parte Order re Application)
Date: 2019-03-08T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel))
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: re why the court should not enter the...))
Date: 2019-04-26T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2019-03-07T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of )
Date: 2019-09-03T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re submission of default judgment ...))
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re submission of default judgment ...) of )
Date: 2020-11-05T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order re: Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-03-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package; Status Confere...) of )
Date: 2019-12-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...) of )
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference Re: Bankruptcy of Sergik Avakian; Status Co...))
Date: 2020-05-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of )
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Plaintiff has not Filed the Defau...))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs (Summary)
Date: 2019-12-11T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Status Conference re Defalut Judgment Package; Status Confere...))
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: as to why the Court should not impose...))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Opposition (PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS AND OPPOSOITION TO MOTIONSTO SET ASIDE DEFAULTS)
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: 2021-07-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2015-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)
Date: 2016-02-24T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-08-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Plaintiff has not Filed the Defau...))
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: as to why the Court should not impose...))
Date: 2021-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment) of 06/29/2021)
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected)
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-07-27T00:00:00Declaration (of Sevak Avakian in support of its Motion to Vacate Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-08-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment))
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Declaration (of Avakian Engineering Inc. in Support of Motion to Vacate)
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Order (Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default)
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (Amended)
Date: 2021-09-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: lodging on new default judgmen...))
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5); He...))
Date: 2021-11-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.