Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Salomon Matthew, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Bruce Benjamin, against Burton Robert, Burton Katherine, represented by Doan Win D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2013 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time338 days |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: January 03, 2014Receipt
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: August 22, 2014Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.