Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shenker Sharon, Shenker Motti, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Law Office Of G. Scott Sobel, against Yacoby Nir, Barrino Loretta, Apartments Brokerage Management, Abm, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael M. Johnson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryOther Real Property (Not Eminent Domain, Landlord/Tenant, Foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time537 days |
Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 09, 2015Answer
Date: 2014-04-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-10-01T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-04-08T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-01-16T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-01-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-06-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-09-24T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Order
Date: June 20, 2014Notice of Ruling
Date: June 23, 2014Ntc of Withdrawal of Lis Pendens
Date: March 19, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.