Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Randhawa Mandeep, Kaur Kirandeep, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Levin And Levin, against Randhawa Sukhra Singh, Patrikh Meena, Parikh Amit Nitin, Does 1 To 20, represented by Chidi Elizabeth M. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Burbank Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial546 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseBurbank Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time478 days |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons ( Patrikh, Meena )
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment and Order
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Change of Firm Name
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Answer to Complaint (AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Parikh, Amit Nitin Patrikh, Meena)
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-11-13T00:00:00Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Receipt (FOR JURY FEE DEPOSIT )
Date: July 11, 2014Proof of Service (notice re: reassignment of case )
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: August 06, 2014Notice of Change of Address
Date: August 06, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.