Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
H.P. Anesthesia Medical Group Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Michael J. Sarrao, against Pacific Health Corporation, Los Angeles Doctors Hospital Associates, Los Angeles Doctors Corporation, Los Angeles Metropolitan Medical Center, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rafael A. Ongkeko presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management84 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryOther Breach Of Contract/Warranty (Not Fraud Or Negligence) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time243 days |
Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Notice Filed by H.P. Anesthesia Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: May 28, 2014Case Management Statement Filed by H.P. Anesthesia Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Document:Notice of Hearing Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Complaint Filed by H.P. Anesthesia Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by H.P. Anesthesia Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Filed by H.P. Anesthesia Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by H.P. Anesthesia Medical Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: May 28, 2014Document:Notice-Settlement Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing
Date: 2013-12-12T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2013-11-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-12-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: May 28, 2014Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2014-05-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.