Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Preferred Employers Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Farmer Case & Fedor, against Bruno Dillon Larado Monta, Does 1 To 50, Dsj West Inc Dba Port Logistics Group, Emo Line Express Inc., Plg Holdings Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith Llp, Worthe Todd C. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Benny C. Osorio presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial540 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions100 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCons With Lead Case (See X-Ref) |
Case Cycle Time443 days |
Amendment to Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Plaintiff in Intervention
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Eric Desion Owens (Legacy Party)
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Summons Filed by Eric Desion Owens (Legacy Party)
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Preferred Employers Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2014-01-23T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Receipt (JURY FEES $150 ) Filed by Attorney for Cross-Defendant
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint ( Tony's Truck & Lube and Tires, ) Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (RELATE BC521670 & BC521234 ) Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Cross-complaint Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff
Date: March 27, 2018Complaint Filed by Preferred Employers Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Preferred Employers Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint Filed by Tony's Truck & Lube and Tires, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Summons Filed (x-complaint ) Filed by Atty for Deft and Cross-Complnt
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by Eric Desion Owens (Legacy Party)
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Receipt Filed by Paccar, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Answer to Complaint Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Cross-Defendant
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by Dillon Larado Monta Bruno (Defendant)
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Notice of Related Case Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Summons Filed (x-complaint )
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (DSJ WEST, INC. DBA PORT LOGISTICS GROUP )
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment and Order
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases (RELATE BC521670 & BC521234 )
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Cross-complaint
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice)
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint ( Paccar, Inc. Kenworth Truck Company; DBA)
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-12-27T00:00:00Answer to Complaint
Date: 2013-12-18T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2014-01-23T00:00:00Receipt (JURY FEES $150 )
Date: 2014-01-27T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons ((2) Tony's Truck & Lube and Tires, Inc Inland Kenworth (US)Inc.- )
Date: 2014-01-23T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons (ON X-COMP AS TO: Paccar, Inc. Kenworth Truck Company; DBA )
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint ( Tony's Truck & Lube and Tires, )
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-02-02T00:00:00Notice-Related Cases
Date: 2014-01-30T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Stip & Order-Continue Trial,FSC-PI (NEW DATES 8/27/15 9/10/15 )
Date: 2014-10-31T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2014-02-18T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-01-29T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: March 27, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.