Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ramirez Martha Patricia, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kottler Douglas E. Esq., against Los Angeles City Of, represented by Michael N. Feuer City Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Elia Weinbach presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time652 days |
Notice
Date: 2014-02-21T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-10-31T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: September 05, 2014Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: July 02, 2015Notice of Settlement
Date: January 28, 2015Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-10-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.