Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kim Diana, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of J.P. Pak, against Premier La, Lee Kevin, Heygrand Inc. Doe 1, represented by Hart James P. Jr. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Howard L. Halm presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 18, 2013 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time562 days |
Notice
Date: 2014-03-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 03, 2015Brief
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: March 06, 2015Jury Instructions
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2013-09-24T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-03-04T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.