Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
London & Co. Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Chapman Gluckman Dean Roeb & Barger Apc, against Excello Copy Company, Govro Roberta, Lagnod Inc., represented by Derek S. Leighnor Law Offices Of, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management74 days |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2013 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial1556 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions630 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment By Court |
Case Cycle Time1807 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE OR TAX COSTS CLAIMED BY DEFENDANTS ETC.
Date: November 09, 2016OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO TAX COSTS
Date: May 04, 2017ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TAX DEFENDANT'S COSTS
Date: May 18, 2017CORRECTED (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT ON CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: May 29, 2018Complaint
Date: 2013-06-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-06-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-08-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-07-18T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2013-08-08T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2013-08-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-08-16T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-08-20T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2013-09-19T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-01-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2014-02-24T00:00:00Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: 2014-03-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-04-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-04-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-05-05T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-05-09T00:00:00Second Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2014-08-12T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-07-11T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2014-09-26T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2014-10-29T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-11-04T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2014-11-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-12-10T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-01-06T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2015-01-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2015-01-13T00:00:00Notice of Designation of Record
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Appeal
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: 2015-01-14T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2015-01-30T00:00:00Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal
Date: 2015-03-04T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2015-03-05T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2015-03-09T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-03-09T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2016-01-26T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-07-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2016-10-04T00:00:00Unknown Document Type
Date: 2016-10-14T00:00:00Memo of Costs on Appeal
Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-11-09T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-12-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2016-12-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2016-12-21T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-05-12T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-05-04T00:00:00Order
Date: 2017-05-18T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-09-01T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2017-06-30T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Witness List
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2017-09-25T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2017-11-08T00:00:00Brief
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2018-02-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2017-12-20T00:00:00Statement of Decision
Date: 2018-03-13T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: May 29, 2018Judgment
Date: May 29, 2018Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2018-05-01T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.