Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Aburto Alma, Galvan Esmeralda Dism, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aplc James Hawkins, against Herbalife International Inc., Herbalife International Of America Inc., represented by Winston & Strawn Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Kenneth R. Freeman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth R. Freeman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management750 days |
Filing DateMay 30, 2013 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time1378 days |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO PLAINTIFF ALMA ALBURTO
Date: November 03, 2016Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL-CIVIL
Date: November 03, 2016Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil -
Date: January 12, 2017Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2013-08-26T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-05-30T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-06-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-08-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-07-29T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2013-08-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-06-10T00:00:00Order
Date: 2013-09-25T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-06-18T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-08-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-01-17T00:00:00Response
Date: 2014-01-09T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-02-14T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2014-05-21T00:00:00Brief-Reply
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2014-09-18T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2015-11-13T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-05-07T00:00:00Request
Date: 2016-03-09T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-01-22T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-07-30T00:00:00Points and Authorities
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2016-04-20T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2015-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Supplemental Declaration
Date: 2016-09-13T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00Status Report
Date: 2016-08-30T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-09-07T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: February 03, 2017Notice
Date: 2016-10-27T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: March 09, 2017Declaration
Date: 2016-10-03T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2017-02-01T00:00:00Order
Date: 2016-10-26T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-09-14T00:00:00Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: February 08, 2017Order
Date: 2017-01-12T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2016-11-03T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.