Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cma Credit Management Association, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) case against Phoenix Hill, represented by Tate Theresa Crawford, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Holly E. Kendig presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management174 days |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2013 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial543 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time529 days |
Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-09-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-10-28T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-10-08T00:00:00Receipt
Date: November 20, 2013Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: October 21, 2014Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-10-18T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2013-07-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: November 20, 2013Request for Dismissal
Date: November 03, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.