Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Okwaraibekwe Jude, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Akudinobi & Ikonte, against Tanco Engineering Inc., represented by Amundson Steven C. Esq., Manning & Kass Ellrod Ramirez Trester, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Barbara A. Meiers presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management186 days |
|
Filing DateMay 23, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial893 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions231 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time742 days |
Notice of Settlement
Date: June 04, 2015Summons
Date: 2013-06-27T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-08-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2014-09-04T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-12-04T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-12-24T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-04-17T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: September 22, 2015Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2013-05-24T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-09-18T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2014-09-02T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-09-29T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-09-17T00:00:00Notice of Motion
Date: 2014-03-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.