Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lax & Stevens A Professional Law Corpor-, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Alonso Sonia Dapuetto, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rolf M. Treu presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management92 days |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2013 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions135 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time135 days |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2013-03-21T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2013-05-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2013-04-05T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-06-13T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-06-06T00:00:00Judgment
Date: June 26, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.