Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Walsh Kelly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Aminpour A. King Esq., against So Cal Limo, Limo Bus Inc., Does 1 To 10, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Teresa A. Beaudet presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2013 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Pi/Pd/Wd (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time640 days |
Notice of Reassignment and Order
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Notice of Reassignment and Order
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application (RE CONT TRIAL AND FSC )
Date: June 03, 2014Notice-Change-Firm Name / Address
Date: 2013-08-05T00:00:00Order (RULING ON MOTION (GRANTED) )
Date: 2013-09-13T00:00:00Receipt (jury fee deposit )
Date: February 06, 2014Motion for Leave
Date: 2013-08-02T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference
Date: 2013-11-06T00:00:00Receipt (Jury Fees Deposit O/B: Zurich American Insurance Com )
Date: 2014-01-31T00:00:00Opposition Document (RE EX PARTE TO CONT TRIAL & FSC )
Date: June 03, 2014Notice (Of Jury Fee Deposit )
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Order (RE EX PARTE TO CONT TRIAL )
Date: June 03, 2014Paper file imaged and destroyed
Date: January 26, 2017Notice-PI Settlement Conf & Order
Date: July 24, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.