Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcphederain Marisa Ann, Oviatt Events Llc, Truly Yours Catering Inc., Tyc Events Llc, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ourfalian & Ourfalian, against 617 Olive Llc, represented by Fagerholm John Esq., Mittskus Danielle D., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael J. Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2013 |
CategoryPremises Liability (E.G.Slip & Fall) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions478 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time947 days |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-02-25T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-02-28T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2013-03-22T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-03-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-03-26T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2013-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Lodging
Date: 2013-03-25T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2013-05-09T00:00:00Summons Issued
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-05-21T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-05-14T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-05-22T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2013-06-21T00:00:00Request
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Answer to Cross-Complaint
Date: 2013-07-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2013-07-19T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2013-07-23T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2013-10-09T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2013-09-06T00:00:00Association of Attorney
Date: 2013-10-11T00:00:00Motion for Leave
Date: 2013-11-07T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2013-11-01T00:00:00Receipt
Date: 2013-11-08T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint
Date: 2013-11-15T00:00:00Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt
Date: 2013-12-16T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-01-15T00:00:00Motion for Summary Adjudication
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Order
Date: 2014-01-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00First Amended Cross Complaint
Date: 2014-01-08T00:00:00Statement of Facts
Date: 2014-05-23T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2014-02-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2014-05-27T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2014-06-16T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: 2014-06-04T00:00:00Partial Dismissal (with Prejudice)
Date: June 27, 2014For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.