Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Novoa Monica, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Stephen Danz & Associates, Law Offices Of Brian Vogel, against Shirazi Behzad, Parham Soleil, Parham & Shirazi A Dental Corporation, Does 1 To 100, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2013 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed - Other |
Case Cycle Time331 days |
OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: October 01, 2013Proof of Service (SOLEIL PARHAM )
Date: 2013-03-07T00:00:00Paper file imaged and destroyed
Date: January 26, 2017Statement-Case Management
Date: 2013-05-23T00:00:00Proof of Service (BEHZAD SHIRAZI )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-02-13T00:00:00Proof of Service (PARHAM & SHIRAZI )
Date: 2013-03-01T00:00:00Statement-Case Management
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Notice-Case Management Conference
Date: 2013-05-15T00:00:00Request for Dismissal (W/PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION )
Date: January 08, 2014Answer to Complaint
Date: 2013-05-29T00:00:00Notice (OF MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONF. )
Date: July 08, 2013Notice-Settlement
Date: October 24, 2013Order-Case Management
Date: June 11, 2013For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.