Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harris Michael, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Box Jack In The, represented by Peterson Charles Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard L. Fruin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2013 |
CategoryFraud (No Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions79 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time79 days |
Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice
Date: 2013-03-12T00:00:00Judgment
Date: May 01, 2013Complaint
Date: 2013-02-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-03-21T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-03-11T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2013-02-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2013-02-20T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2013-04-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2013-04-02T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: April 25, 2013Order
Date: May 01, 2013Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: May 01, 2013Minute order entered: 2013-04-23 00:00:00
Date: 2013-04-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.