Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Estate Of Karla H. Brada, Mendez Hector, Mendez Jaroslava, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Barry Patricia J., Noland John W., against Alcoholics Anonymous World Services Inc., Anonymous Santa Clarita Alcoholics, Carrillo Juan, Caruso Carey, Earle Eric Allen, (total of 13) See All represented by Tate John R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rita Miller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRita Miller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2012 |
CategoryCivil Rights/Discrimination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions729 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time1595 days |
Complaint
Date: 2012-09-25T00:00:00Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)
Date: 2012-10-05T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-10-09 00:00:00
Date: 2012-10-09T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-10-16T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-08-14 00:00:00
Date: 2013-08-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2013-01-25 00:00:00
Date: 2013-01-25T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-02-19 00:00:00
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2014-02-19T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-09-22 00:00:00
Date: 2014-09-22T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2014-05-19 00:00:00
Date: 2014-05-19T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2014-09-24T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2014-11-17T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2014-11-03T00:00:00General Denial
Date: 2014-11-17T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2014-12-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-12-19T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2014-12-30T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-01-05 00:00:00
Date: 2015-01-05T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2015-01-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-02-05T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Request to Waive Court Fees
Date: 2015-02-03T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2015-03-06T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2015-03-03T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2015-02-19T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-03-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-03-25 00:00:00
Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-04-02T00:00:00Objection Document
Date: 2015-04-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-04-16 00:00:00
Date: 2015-04-16T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Summons
Date: 2015-06-15T00:00:00Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-06-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-05-15T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2015-07-27T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2015-08-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Motion for Continuance
Date: 2015-08-20T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-09-14T00:00:00Answer to Second Amended Complaint
Date: 2015-08-25T00:00:00Motion to Quash
Date: 2015-08-19T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2015-11-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-09-28 00:00:00
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-11-10T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2015-11-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-20 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter
Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2015-11-19 00:00:00
Date: 2015-11-19T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-01-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Judgment
Date: 2016-01-11T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2015-12-09T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-11 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-11T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-17 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-17T00:00:00Demurrer
Date: 2016-04-12T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-06-09 00:00:00
Date: 2016-06-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-08-19 00:00:00
Date: 2016-08-19T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2016-11-18T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2016-11-07T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-03-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-02-22 00:00:00
Date: 2016-02-22T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2016-01-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-11-23 00:00:00
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-04-04 00:00:00
Date: 2016-04-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2016-09-21 00:00:00
Date: 2016-09-21T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2016-05-06T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-30 00:00:00
Date: January 30, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-01-03 00:00:00
Date: 2017-01-03T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2017-01-05 00:00:00
Date: January 05, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-02-06 00:00:00
Date: February 06, 2017Minute order entered: 2017-02-17 00:00:00
Date: February 17, 2017For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.