Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cumplido Maria, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcgurk Candice Denice, against Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor-, represented by Martin Michael G. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 17, 2011 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time439 days |
Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-07-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-07-01T00:00:00Opposition Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's ex parte motion; Filed by: Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-01-04T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Document:Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: September 18, 2012Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Exhibit List Joint; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Document:Stipulation Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Document:Statement of Case Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Document:Answer to Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-07-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Document:Order-Case Management Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-02-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Document:Request and Entry of Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-08-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Stipulation Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-05-04T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Document:List of Exhibits Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2012-05-01T00:00:00Statement of the Case Joint; Filed by: Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-06-28 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-06-28T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-03-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-07-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Document:Jury Instructions Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Document:Motion in Limine Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-04-20T00:00:00Notice Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-04T00:00:00Document:Reply/Response Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-12-29 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-04-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-04-02T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Document:Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-07-28T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Motion in Limine Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-04-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2011-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-08-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-05-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-05-16T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Statement of the Case Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case (Joint) Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Jury Instructions Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-05-01T00:00:00Reply/Response Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-05-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-08-29T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint) Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-07-09 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-07-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-05-23 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-05-23T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: September 18, 2012Minute order entered: 2012-09-18 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: September 18, 2012Minute order entered: 2012-05-21 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-05-21T00:00:00Exhibit List Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Notice Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-08-16 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-08-16T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's ex parte motion) Filed by Maria Cumplido (Plaintiff)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Los Angeles County Metropolitan Transpor- (Defendant)
Date: 2012-07-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-06-17T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-06-28 00:00:00
Date: 2011-06-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-07-01 00:00:00
Date: 2011-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2011-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2011-07-20T00:00:00Proof-Service/Summons
Date: 2011-07-13T00:00:00Notice of Status Conference filed
Date: 2011-07-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2011-08-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-07-28T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-08-18 00:00:00
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2011-12-28T00:00:00Stipulation
Date: 2011-09-16T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2011-08-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2012-01-04T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2011-12-29 00:00:00
Date: 2011-12-29T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-02-02 00:00:00
Date: 2012-02-02T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Statement of the Case
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-04-02 00:00:00
Date: 2012-04-02T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-05-14 00:00:00
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Exhibit List (Joint)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-05-21 00:00:00
Date: 2012-05-21T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-05-16 00:00:00
Date: 2012-05-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-03-23 00:00:00
Date: 2012-03-23T00:00:00Motion in Limine
Date: 2012-04-20T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's opposition to defendant's ex parte motion)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-05-04T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (for continuance of trial)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Statement of the Case (Joint)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2012-07-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-05-23 00:00:00
Date: 2012-05-23T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2012-05-01T00:00:00Exhibit List
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Ex Parte Application for Continuance of Trial)
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Reply/Response
Date: 2012-05-07T00:00:00Jury Instructions
Date: 2012-05-14T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-08-16 00:00:00
Date: 2012-08-16T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2012-07-10T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-07-09 00:00:00
Date: 2012-07-09T00:00:00Minute order entered: 2012-09-18 00:00:00
Date: September 18, 2012Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S
Date: September 18, 2012Request for Dismissal
Date: 2012-08-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.