Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wilkins Yavaughnie, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Ukra Bahjat S., represented by Murchison & Cumming Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 20, 2011 |
CategoryOther Commercial/Business Tort (Not Fraud/ Breach Of Contract) (General Jurisdiction) |
Time To Trial430 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Case Cycle Time1782 days |
Document:Answer Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2012-05-25T00:00:00Complaint Filed by YaVaughnie Wilkins (Plaintiff)
Date: 2011-05-20T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Document:Reply to Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-08T00:00:00Document:Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2013-10-30T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-01-06T00:00:00Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-09-15T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2011-09-20T00:00:00Document:Order Filed by: Court
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2012-03-08T00:00:00Document:Proof-Service/Summons Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2011-06-16T00:00:00Motion to Strike Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2012-05-24T00:00:00Document:Motion Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-02-07T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Document:Motion to Strike Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00Document:Declaration Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed by Defendant
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other Filed by Court
Date: 2012-09-11T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2013-03-28T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application Filed by Defendant
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Notice Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-09-15T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr
Date: 2013-03-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00First Amended Complaint Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Document:Miscellaneous-Other Filed by: Court
Date: 2012-09-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Opposition Document Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-01-06T00:00:00Document:Request for Dismissal Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: April 08, 2016Document:Notice of Continuance Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2012-12-04T00:00:00Document:Stipulation and Order Filed by: Defendant
Date: 2012-08-31T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Bahjat S. Ukra (Defendant)
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-02-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2012-05-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Bahjat S. Ukra (Defendant)
Date: 2012-12-04T00:00:00Document:First Amended Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Document:Notice of Ruling Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Order Filed by Court
Date: 2011-09-20T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-07-15T00:00:00Reply to Motion Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-04-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner
Date: April 08, 2016Order Filed by Court
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2013-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2011-05-20T00:00:00Document:Opposition Document Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2011-06-01T00:00:00Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2013-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-06-01T00:00:00Stipulation and Order Filed by Defendant
Date: 2012-08-31T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-06-01T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-05-20T00:00:00Motion to Strike
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00First Amended Complaint
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2011-07-12T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2011-09-02T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2011-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2011-09-07T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2012-01-06T00:00:00Answer to First Amended Complaint
Date: 2011-10-06T00:00:00Order
Date: 2011-09-20T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2012-01-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2012-05-25T00:00:00Motion
Date: 2013-02-07T00:00:00Ex-Parte Application
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Miscellaneous-Other
Date: 2012-09-11T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2012-12-04T00:00:00Stipulation and Order
Date: 2012-08-31T00:00:00Opposition Document
Date: 2013-03-28T00:00:00Declaration
Date: 2012-12-03T00:00:00Reply to Motion
Date: 2013-04-08T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2013-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2013-07-15T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-12-02T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2014-11-24T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: April 08, 2016Notice of Ruling
Date: 2014-02-20T00:00:00Order
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.