Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beauty Plus Sales And Marketing U.S.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Imastar Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Edward A. Ferns presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2011 |
CategoryCollections Case - Seller Plaintiff (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time402 days |
Document:Notice-Recusal-ADR Neutral Filed by: Mediator
Date: 2011-05-17T00:00:00Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A
Date: 2011-01-03T00:00:00Document:Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by: Mediator
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Document:Answer to Unverified Complaint Filed by: Attorney for Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-02-15T00:00:00Document:Ex-Parte Application Filed by: Plaintiff
Date: February 24, 2012Document:Notice-Mediation Hearing Date Filed by: Mediator
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Document:Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator Filed by: ADR Clerk
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Deft/Respnt
Date: 2011-04-29T00:00:00Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00Notice-Recusal-ADR Neutral Filed by Mediator
Date: 2011-05-17T00:00:00Notice-Mediation Hearing Date Filed by Mediator
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Answer Filed by Defendant/Respondent
Date: 2011-02-15T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Beauty Plus Sales and Marketing (U.S.A.) (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD
Date: 2011-01-03T00:00:00Statement-Non-Agreement Filed by Mediator
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk
Date: 2011-01-05T00:00:00Document:Notice-Assignment-Mediator Filed by: ADR Clerk CADR
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2011-01-05T00:00:00Case Management Statement Filed by Imastar Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2011-04-29T00:00:00Notice-Recusal-ADR Neutral
Date: 2011-05-17T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2011-04-29T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2011-01-03T00:00:00Notice-Mediation Hearing Date
Date: 2011-06-27T00:00:00Statement-Non-Agreement
Date: 2011-08-01T00:00:00Notice-Assignment-Mediator
Date: 2011-05-11T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2011-02-15T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2011-01-05T00:00:00Notice-Reassgnment-Mediator
Date: 2011-05-24T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.