Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
American Automobile Insurance Company, Fireman'S Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, filed a(n) Mass Torts - Torts case represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein Llp, O'Connor Cozen, against Toyota Mot. Eng'Ng & Mfg Na Inc, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Mfg Ca Inc., Toyota Motor North America Inc., Toyota Motor Sales U.S.A. Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Alston & Bird Llp, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Amy D. Hogue presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management187 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryProduct Liability (Not Asbestos Or Toxic/Environmental) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeMass Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time427 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by National Surety Corporation (Plaintiff) |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 20 Status Conference (Status Conference; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-07-14 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-07-05 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 20 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) - |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 20 Court Order - Held |
|
May 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-05-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2011-04-19 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 20 Hearing on Motion to Dismiss (MOTION-DISMISS; Proceedings Stayed) - |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.