Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Azizian Farzad, filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Hariton Joe Esq., against Damavandi Mehran, represented by Ardalan P. Christopher Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Daniel J. Buckley presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management119 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time490 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 (OSC RE Dismissal; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Farzad Azizian (Plaintiff) |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 (OSC RE Dismissal; Continued by Plaintiff) - |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Non-Appearance Case Review - Held |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 35 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Case Deemed Settled at Settle Conf) - |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DEPARTMENT 35 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.