Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baustita-Garcia Nestor Florencio, Baustita-Nino Florencio, Bautista-Garcia Maria Guadalupe, Bautista-Garcia Silvia Alicia, Gines Jacqueline, (total of 24) See All filed a(n) Negligent Breach - Commercial case against Perlin Properties, Rance Patricia S., Whitzman Dolores S., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Rolf M. Treu presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryNegligent Breach Of Contract/Warranty (No Fraud) (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeNegligent Breach |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time522 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event | RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT | |
November 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | RECEIPT AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF ORDER FOR THE DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 (Trial; Vacated) - |
|
June 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
June 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 58 Unknown Event Type - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 04, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGMENT FOR CAL. RU MINOR OR PERSON WITH A DISABILITY (MISCELLANEOUS) | |
May 24, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.