Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pacific Bell Telephone Company, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Pollick Mark Esq., against California American Water, American Water Works Service Company Inc, represented by Anielski Jeffrey M., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Alan S. Rosenfield presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryOther Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time189 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Vacated) - |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Vacated) - |
|
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Vacated) - |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Court Order (Court Order; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff) |
|
June 07, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event | NQTICEOF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES | |
April 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Pacific Bell Telephone Company (Plaintiff) |
|
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 31 Case Management Conference - Held |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.