Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cny Stars Inc., filed a(n) Contractual Fraud - Commercial case represented by Soukiasian Janine A., Choi Vincent Y., against Weatherby Realty, Lee Won Young, Kim Sung Bok, Kang Jay, California Departmnet Of Alcohol Beverage, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management184 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContractual Fraud (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeContractual Fraud |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time244 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Jury Trial (Jury Trial; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Final Status Conference (Final Status Conference; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 Post-Mediation Status Conference (Conference-Post Mediation Status; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSA; AND PROOF OF SERVICE | |
August 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by CNY Stars, Inc. (Plaintiff) |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 32 (Order to Show Cause; Order of Dismissal) - |
|
August 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Filed by Weatherby Realty (Legacy Party) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.