Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Orozco Eduardo, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Younessi Ramin R. Esq., against Nancy Chavez - Doe 1, Monthes Pallets Inc., Monthes Jesus, represented by Law Offices Of James M. Gilbert, Law Offices Of Darren D. Daniels, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Joanne B. O'Donnell presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions154 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time421 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) - (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) - |
|
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-04-02 00:00:00 | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC RE Dismissal Joanne B. O'Donnell 9:00 am | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 (OSC RE Dismissal; Off Calendar) - |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Jury Trial Joanne B. O'Donnell 9:00 am | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2012-02-29 00:00:00 | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
in Department 37 Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated |
|
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Document:Notice Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
February 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Eduardo Orozco (Plaintiff) Filed by Eduardo Orozco (Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.