Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON VS ANNA MOSKOVYAN
On November 30, 2010 an other real property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (general jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Abraham Khan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 30, 2010
Last Refreshed
February 03, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Stanley Mosk Courthouse
Category
Other Real Property (not eminent domain, landlord/tenant, foreclosure) (General Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Case Outcome Type
Legacy Judgment
Status
Default Judgment
Case Duration
9 months and 8 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Memorandum of Costs Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF .PUI)GMENT IC.C P 664.51 | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | MEMO COSTS SUMMARY | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Costs Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Dispo/Manner:Other Judgment 282 Days | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-09-08 00:00:00 | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Discharged) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Discharged) - |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT PROVE UP AGAINST ANNA MOSKOVYAN C.C.P. 585, 764.010) | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Judgment Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Abraham Khan 8:45 am | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT PROVE UP AGAINST ANNA MOSKOVYAN C.C.P. 585, 764.010) | |
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
September 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Discharged) - |
|
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
August 11, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Abraham Khan | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-08-11 00:00:00 | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | RULING RE: DEFAULT PROVE-UP BY PLAINTIFF. | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Abraham Khan 8:45 am | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event | RULING RE: DEFAULT PROVE-UP BY PLAINTIFF. | |
August 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-06-27 00:00:00 | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Abraham Khan 8:45 am | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event | MINUTE ORDER | |
June 27, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Abraham Khan | |
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 (OSC-Failure to File Default Judg; Matter continued) - |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | PIA1TIFFS APPL1CAT1O FOR DEFAULT PROVE UP AGAINST ANNA MOSKOVYAN C.C.P. 55, 764.010); Memorandum of Points and Authorities | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Partial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice) Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
June 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Application Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
April 25, 2011 | hearing | Calendaring:OSC-Failure to File Default Judg Abraham Khan | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding/Event:Conference-Case Management Abraham Khan 8:45 am | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute order entered: 2011-04-25 00:00:00 | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 51 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Off Calendar) - |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Statement-Case Management Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) |
|
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Notice of Change of Address Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTTCE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Document:Default Entered Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Default Entered Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) |
|
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Proof of Service Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE Summons | |
December 27, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff); Bank of New York, The (Legacy Party) |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by: Clerk | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
December 02, 2010 | hearing | Calendaring:Conference-Case Management Abraham Khan | |
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk Filed by Clerk |
|
December 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Filed/Opened:Other Real Property Rights Case | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Document:Complaint Filed by: N/A | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff) PROCEEDINGS HELD Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff) |
|
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: 1) CANCELLLATION OF INSTRUMENT; ETC. | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR: 1) CANCELLLATION OF INSTRUMENT; ETC. | |
November 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed by Bank of New York Mellon, The (Plaintiff) |