Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Jacobs Rosalie, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Garcia Gilbert A., against Sagar Anil, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Richard E. Rico presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle - Personal Injury/Property Damage/Wrongful Death (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeCourt-Ordered Dismissal - Other (Other) |
Case Cycle Time104 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
March 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Vacated) - |
|
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 (Order to Show Cause; Vacated) - |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
in Department 17 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Vacated) - |
|
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement Filed by Rosalie Jacobs (Plaintiff) |
|
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING | |
December 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.