Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Arkland Investment Llc, Chapter7 Trustee Of The Estate Of Arkland, Kurtz Heide, filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case represented by Blasberg Teresa Esq., Blum Collins Llp, against 2700 Wilshire Llc, Sixth And Virgil Llc, Universal Bank, Whang Stuart, represented by Alberstone Daniel Esq., Arya John D., Chenetz Sara L. Esq., Chung Jay J. Esq., Hooks Cassandra E., (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mark V. Mooney presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management244 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryQuiet Title (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions380 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeDeemed Complete (No Remand From Federal Court) |
Case Cycle Time2862 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-10-01 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 Unknown Event Type - Held |
|
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minute order entered: 2018-04-02 00:00:00 Filed by Clerk |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
in Department 68 (Order to Show Cause; Matter continued) - |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Jeff, Katofsky, Esq. (Legacy Party) |
|
October 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SEHLEMENT OF ACTION AS TO MOHAMMED ISLAM ONLY | |
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by Intervenor |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.