Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Friedman David, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Levine Peter K. Esq., against Jda Software Inc., represented by Greenberg Traurig Llp, Wulffson Todd R., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Michael L. Stern presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management91 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2010 |
CategoryOther Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions548 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeLegacy Judgment |
Case Cycle Time548 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Abandon Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
November 07, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL | |
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event | ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE) | |
November 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Abandonment of Appeal (from S.C.) Filed by David Friedman (Plaintiff) |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Ntc to Attorney re Notice of Appeal Filed by Clerk |
|
October 09, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO ATTORNEY IN RE NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |
October 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed by David Friedman (Plaintiff) |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed by JDA Software, Inc. (Defendant) |
|
August 24, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT'S AUGUST 22, 2012 RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND TAX PORTIONS OF DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.